skip to content

Discipline Hearings

Print page icon

In order to protect the health and safety of everyone involved and to limit the spread of the COVID-19 virus, the CPSO has temporarily stopped in-person hearings in favour of virtual hearings. These proceedings remain open to the public. Anyone who wishes to observe the hearings via videoconference should contact [email protected].

HEARING DETAILS
MEMBER NAME
Decision Date

May 11, 2021
Virtual Hearing

Start time: 9 a.m.

HU, William
*Scarborough
Details

Allegations of Dr. Hu’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Hu is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Hu engaged in acts or omissions that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in respect to his ongoing care and treatment of patients who were also family members and by engaging in inappropriate billing practices, including inappropriately billing the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. It is also alleged that Dr. Hu engaged in sexual abuse of a patient.


View Profile
Decision Date

May 11, 2021
Virtual Reprimand

Start time: 10:30 a.m.

BAILEY, Brian Clare
*Practice Address Not Available
Details

On May 6, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bailey committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.


View Profile
Decision Date

May 18, 2021
Virtual Reprimand

Start time: 11 a.m.

GILL, Harmander Singh
*Practice Address Not Available
Details

On April 16, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gill has committed an act of professional misconduct in that:  he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee also found that Dr. Gill is incompetent.


View Profile
Decision Date

May 19, 2021
Virtual Hearing

Start time: 9 a.m.

KHAN, Mohammed Asif Hameed
*Waterloo
Details

Allegations of Dr. Khan’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Khan is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct in his prescribing practices between approximately 2016 and 2018 including in appropriately co-signing prescriptions, in his assessments, communications and medical record-keeping in respect of these prescriptions, in being paid to co-sign prescriptions and in providing blank prescriptions to an acquaintance.


View Profile
Decision Date

May 20, 2021
Virtual Reprimand

Start time: 11 a.m.

JHA, Neilank Kumar
*Vaughan
Details

On August 27, 2020, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jha committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability.


View Profile
Decision Date

May 25-28 & 31, 2021
Virtual Hearing

Start time: 9 a.m.

BEAUCHEMIN, Suzanna Marie
*Gloucester
Details

Allegations of Dr. Beauchemin’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Beauchemin engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to comply in a timely manner or at all with the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Decision of December 14, 2017, requiring that she complete a specified continuing education or remediation program. It is also alleged that Dr. Beauchemin engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect of a patient, including by, but not limited to in her conduct and behaviour towards a patient with respect to scheduling and attendance at appointments; by failing to provide test results to Patient A; inappropriately ending the physician-patient relationship with a patient; and/or failing to ensure that a complete and comprehensive medical record was maintained for a patient. In addition, Dr. Beauchemin engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to cooperate during the College investigation, including by failing to respond to the College in a timely manner.


View Profile
Decision Date

May 25-26, 2021
Virtual Hearing

Start time: 9 a.m.

GILL, Harmander Singh
*Practice Address Not Available
Details

Allegations of Dr. Gill’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Gill engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in failing to cooperate with a College investigation, from approximately April 2018 onwards, including by failing to cooperate with respect to observation of his practice and a requested interview; and failing to respond to inquiries from a College investigator, and to provide answers to questions from the investigator.


View Profile
Decision Date

June 4, 2021
Virtual Hearing

Start time: 9 a.m.

FAGBEMIGUN, Ayokunle
*Etobicoke
Details

Allegations of Dr. Fagbemigun’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Fagbemigun Dr. Fagbemigun is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover.Dr. Fagbemigun engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to: inappropriately billing the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, including for services not rendered; creating false/inaccurate records; providing and/or billing for services not clinically indicated; and/or by accepting a referral fee and/or commission for the referral of patients.


View Profile
Decision Date

June 7, 2021
Virtual Hearing

Start time: 9 a.m.

BELL, Thomas Albert Botly
*Toronto
Details

Allegations of Dr. Bell’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Bell failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of Ms A. It is also alleged that Dr. Bell engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in respect of his treatment of Ms A, including in his prescribing and/or providing medical treatment to a family member/person close to him.


View Profile
Decision Date

June 9 & 10, 2021
Virtual Hearing

Start time: 9 a.m.

FAGBEMIGUN, Ayokunle
*Etobicoke
Details

Allegations of Dr. Fagbemigun’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Fagbemigun Dr. Fagbemigun is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients, whose identities have been disclosed under separate cover.Dr. Fagbemigun engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to: inappropriately billing the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, including for services not rendered; creating false/inaccurate records; providing and/or billing for services not clinically indicated; and/or by accepting a referral fee and/or commission for the referral of patients.


View Profile

NOTE:  The physician’s current location (*) as indicated on the Public Register is noted. This schedule is subject to change. For further information contact the Communications Department, 416-967-2611 or 1-800-268-7096 ext. 611.